HB0470

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection

Sponsored by:

Delegate Otto

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Abolishing the elected position of County Treasurer of Somerset County; transferring the duties and functions of the office of County Treasurer to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection, who shall work under the direction of the County Finance Director; repealing provisions related to the appointment and salary of the deputy treasurer of Somerset County; providing that the Act does not affect the term of office of the incumbent County Treasurer; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Otto
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Bonds -see also- County & Baltimore City Bonds; State Bonds
County Administrators
County Commissioners
Discipline
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Salaries -see also- Overtime; Reimbursement Rates
Somerset County
Treasurers
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(10-202)
Article - Local Government
(16-204)
Article - Somerset County
(7-101, 7-102, 7-103, 7-104, 7-105, 7-106, 7-107, 7-108, 7-109, 7-110, 7-111, 7-112, 7-113, 7-114, 7-115, 7-116, 7-117, 7-118, 7-202, 7-203, 7-204, 7-205, 7-302, 9-103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments {540417/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (137-1)48A
Senate3/19/20133/17/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation48
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.