HB0476

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds

Sponsored by:

Delegate Simmons

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Providing that, if a defendant who has posted a bail bond is taken into custody and deported by a specified agency of the federal government because of the defendant's immigration status, the bond shall be null and void; providing that any bond that becomes null and void under the Act shall be returned to the surety and the surety shall have no liability with respect to the bond; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Simmons
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0720
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0551 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Aliens and Citizenship
Bail
Bonds -see also- County & Baltimore City Bonds; State Bonds
Federal Government
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Pretrial Detention or Release
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(5-206.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {142716/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 40
3/7/20133/7/2013Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (121-14)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings44

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.