HB0480 (CH0301)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's County

Sponsored by:

Delegate Davis

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301


Synopsis:Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to establish a consumer affairs satellite office located in Prince George's County; providing for the purpose of establishing a consumer affairs satellite office; requiring the consumer affairs satellite office to provide consumers with specified resources; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to give priority to a specified site when determining the location of the consumer affairs satellite office; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Davis, Ivey, Barnes, Braveboy, Frush, Gaines, Griffith, Healey, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Niemann, Proctor, Summers, Swain, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Walker, A. Washington, A. Kelly, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, and Reznik
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0508
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0234 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations   View Committee HearingFinance   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Narrow Subject(s):Attorney General
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Reports
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:50 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/27/20141/27/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20142/25/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/26/20142/26/2014Favorable with Amendments {616785/1 Report Adopted36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
2/28/20142/28/2014Third Reading Passed (112-20)38
Senate3/3/20143/3/2014First Reading Finance37
3/11/20143/11/2014Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20143/28/2014Favorable Report by Finance
3/28/20143/21/2014Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/31/20143/22/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)56
House4/1/20143/25/2014Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:50 P.M.