HB0490 (CH0200)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and Penalties

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cullison

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200


Synopsis:Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Nursing appoint specified peer review committees; authorizing the Board to appoint peer advisory committees to provide the Board with expert advice related to the practice of nursing by advance practice nurses; providing that a member of a peer advisory committee is entitled to receive compensation, as determined by the Board, and reimbursement for specified expenses; altering the maximum amount of a specified civil fine the Board may impose; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Cullison
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0393
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Reimbursement Rates
Review Boards
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Statutes:Article - Health Occupations
(8-503, 8-707, 8-710)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20162/1/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/9/20163/9/2016Favorable with Amendments {296686/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/11/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)43
Senate3/14/20163/14/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)61A
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:00 P.M.