HB0491 (CH0120)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Otto

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120


Synopsis:Making specified exceptions to the prohibition against the Somerset County Board of License Commissioners approving a license to sell alcoholic beverages to establishments located within 300 feet of a school, church or other place of worship, public library, or youth center.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Otto
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Churches -see also- Religion
Community Facilities and Services
Libraries -see also- Archives
License Commissioners, Boards of
Private Schools
Public Schools
Somerset County
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(9-220)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (134-1)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.