HB0492 (CH0473)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit

Sponsored by:

Delegate Otto

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473


Synopsis:Adding the Somerset County Economic Development Commission as an eligible governmental unit in the Employees' Pension System; providing that specified individuals are subject to the alternate contributory pension benefit in the Employees' Pension System in the same manner as specified other individuals; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Otto
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Pensions and Retirement
Local Government - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Somerset County
Statutes:Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(23-221, 31-102, 31-111, 31-111.7, 31-116.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Appropriations
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {434968/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation41
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.