HB0506

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses

Sponsored by:

Delegate Carr

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing canceled


Synopsis:Providing that specified noncompete and conflict of interest provisions that restrict the ability of an employee to enter into employment with a new employer or to become self-employed in the same or similar business or trade are null and void as being against the public policy of the State.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Carr, Fennell, Glenn, Hornberger, and Jameson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0468
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1440 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
Narrow Subject(s):Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Interstate Affairs
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(3-715)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2/21/20172/21/2017Favorable Report Adopted30
Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate West) Adopted 30
2/22/20172/22/2017Floor Amendment {683920/1 (Delegate West) Rejected (51-87)31
Second Reading Passed31
2/24/20172/24/2017Third Reading Passed (86-49)33
Senate2/27/20172/27/2017First Reading Finance32
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing canceled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:00 P.M.