HB0526 (CH0288)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Establishment License

Sponsored by:

St. Mary's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288


Synopsis:Establishing an art establishment license in St. Mary's County; specifying that the Board of License Commissioners may issue the license to a for-profit retail business engaged in specified activities; authorizing a license holder to sell or serve beer and wine at retail for on-premises consumption under specified circumstances; specifying the maximum amount of beer and wine to be sold or served to an individual; providing for a $300 annual license fee; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:St. Mary's County Delegation
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB1490 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs -see also- Musms; Theat; etc
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Retail Sales
St. Mary's County
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(28-1001, 28-102)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2017 1:46 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Economic Matters
1/27/20171/27/2017Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)43
Senate3/13/20173/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.