HB0549 (CH0602)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Juneteenth National Freedom Day

Sponsored by:

Delegate Stukes

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim June 19 as Juneteenth National Freedom Day.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Stukes, Anderson, Arora, Clippinger, Conaway, Harper, Ivey, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Summers, and Tarrant
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB1341 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations   View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Governor
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Minorities -see also- Women
Nonresidents -see also- Aliens and Citizenship
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:50 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20141/29/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/5/20142/5/2014Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20143/15/2014Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/15/20143/12/2014Favorable Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed48A
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)49
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20144/2/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/5/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/5/20143/30/2014Returned Passed66
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:50 P.M.