HB0569

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance Study

Sponsored by:

Delegate Elliott

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with local government officials, to conduct a review of State programs that provide financial assistance for costs relating to the planning, design, construction, and upgrade of wastewater treatment facilities in the State; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2013.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Elliott, Afzali, Arora, Aumann, Bates, Beidle, Beitzel, Bobo, Boteler, Bromwell, Burns, Cane, Carr, Cluster, Conaway, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Dumais, Dwyer, Eckardt, Frank, Frush, George, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Hammen, Healey, Hogan, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Impallaria, Jacobs, A. Kelly, K. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Love, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McIntosh, McMillan, A. Miller, W. Miller, Murphy, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Norman, O'Donnell, Oaks, Otto, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rudolph, Schulz, Serafini, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Tarrant, V. Turner, Valentino-Smith, Vitale, Weir, Wilson, and Wood
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Narrow Subject(s):Construction
Environment, Department of
Reports
Sewage
State Aid
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
2/1/20132/1/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs41
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.