HB0583 (CH0121)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - Restrictions

Sponsored by:

Chair, Economic Matters Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121


Synopsis:Altering the circumstances under which the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation is prohibited from removing a benefit charge from the earned rating record of an employing unit; requiring, except under specified circumstances, the Secretary to remove benefits charged to a not for profit organization or governmental entity from the account of the not for profit organization or governmental entity under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Unemployment Insurance
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Nonprofit Organizations
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Unemployment
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(8-611, 8-620)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Economic Matters
2/1/20132/1/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Finance50
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Finance
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/2/20133/28/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)59
House4/2/20133/27/2013Returned Passed60A
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.