HB0617 (CH0383)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ebersole

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383


Synopsis:Authorizing the principal of a public school to select any employee to administer certain assessments, under certain circumstances; and requiring a local superintendent to review and approve a principal's employee selection for administering a certain assessment before the assessment is administered.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Ebersole, Buckel, Luedtke, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Long, Ali, and C. Howard
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0562
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
School Administration
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-203.3)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:31 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {295764/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)47
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.