HB0634 (CH0301)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jackson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301


Synopsis:Establishing the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to study emerging communications technologies and develop a strategy for implementation of Next Generation 9-1-1 services across the State; authorizing the Emergency Number Systems Board to contract with a third-party contractor to provide staff for the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its final findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2019; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Jackson, Chang, Fennell, C. Howard, Knotts, J. Lewis, Lisanti, Proctor, K. Young, Angel, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and West
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0285
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Emergencies
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Frederick County
Grants
Procurement
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 1:13 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {816389/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48A
3/26/20183/26/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Finance
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
House4/4/20183/26/2018Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.