HB0654 (CH0326)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Statewide Kindergarten Assessment - Completion

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326


Synopsis:Altering the date by which a statewide kindergarten assessment that has the purpose of measuring school readiness must be completed from October 1 to October 10.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kaiser, Shoemaker, Atterbeary, Barkley, Cullison, Ebersole, Jackson, Korman, Krebs, Krimm, Lierman, Luedtke, McComas, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Tarlau, Turner, M. Washington, West, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0145
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-210)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed33
2/28/20172/28/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)35
Senate3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs34
4/4/20174/4/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.