HB0662

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on Payouts

Sponsored by:

Delegate Olszewski

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring that regulations adopted by the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission include provisions that require specified gaming payouts to be reported to the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency in a report that contains specified information; and requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to forward the report to the Department of Human Resources Child Support Enforcement Administration for the purpose of enforcing specified child support orders.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:Delegates Olszewski, Arora, Bromwell, DeBoy, Elliott, Frank, Frick, Krebs, Reznik, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, M. Washington, Weir, Wood, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means
Broad Subject(s):Gaming
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Gaming -see also- Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
Human Resources, Department of
Lottery
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony
Statutes:Article - State Government
(9-1A-24)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/28/20132/28/2013Hearing cancelled
3/6/20133/6/2013Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.