HB0667 (CH0262)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262


Synopsis:Requiring public school employers in all jurisdictions of the State to negotiate with employee organizations designated as the exclusive representatives for the public school employees a requirement of a service or representation fee to be charged to nonmembers; exempting specified employees from specified requirements for paying service or representation fees; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Arora, Barkley, Barve, Bobo, Cane, Carr, Clagett, Cullison, DeBoy, Feldman, Frick, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Healey, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, Kramer, Lafferty, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, Minnick, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Pendergrass, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, Stukes, F. Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Weir, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0422
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Collective Bargaining
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Religion -see also- Churches
Teachers
Unions
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-407, 6-504)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20133/14/2013Favorable with Amendments {545366/1 Report Adopted47
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Ready) Adopted 47
3/18/20133/15/2013Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Ready) Withdrawn48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {233024/1 Rejected (42-89)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {183920/1 Rejected (40-91)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {283626/1 Rejected (47-80)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hough) {963221/1 Rejected (47-81)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {693520/148A
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (44-90)48A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {903725/1 Rejected (42-91)48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20133/16/2013Third Reading Passed (95-43)49
Senate3/20/20133/18/2013First Reading Finance49
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {947372/159
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 59
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {947372/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)61
House4/6/20134/1/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (92-35)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.