HB0697 (CH0634)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - Applicability

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634


Synopsis:Altering the scope of the Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act; and authorizing a specified agreement to exclude specified mediation communications from the application of the Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Dumais
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0409
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Mediation -see also- Arbitration
Privacy
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-1802)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20132/4/2013First Reading Judiciary
2/1/20132/1/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable with Amendments {662910/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings50
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.