HB0713 (CH0636)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636


Synopsis:Authorizing a State or local law enforcement agency, on process issued by a court of competent jurisdiction, to seize specified property used or intended for use in connection with a violation of specified criminal statutes relating to human trafficking; specifying the revenue sources for the Fund; providing for disbursements from the Fund for specified purposes; specifying property that is subject to forfeiture; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Dumais, Frick, Afzali, Anderson, Arora, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Bates, Beidle, Bobo, Branch, Bromwell, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, Eckardt, Feldman, Frush, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Hough, Hucker, Impallaria, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Krebs, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, W. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Olszewski, Parrott, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rudolph, Serafini, Sophocleus, Stein, Stukes, Szeliga, Tarrant, F. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0391 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Appraisals
Attorney General
Bonds -see also- County & Baltimore City Bonds; State Bonds
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Forfeiture
Hearings
Human Rights
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Notices
Personal Property
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Search and Seizure
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(13-501 through 13-536)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20132/4/2013First Reading Judiciary
2/1/20132/1/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {132110/1 Report Adopted53A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53A
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (46-1)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.