HB0722 (CH0666)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - Funding

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666


Synopsis:Beginning in fiscal year 2017, increasing the amount of money from $20,000,000 to $40,000,000 the Governor is required to provide in the State budget for the Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms each fiscal year; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Healey, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Turner, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0271
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Education, Boards of
Grants
Public Schools
Statutes:Article - Economic Development
(10-645)
Article - Education
(5-313)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


June 23, 2016 9:41 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/28/20163/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {414066/155A
Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 55A
3/29/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {414066/1 Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
3/30/20163/25/2016Third Reading Passed (114-24)57
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016First Reading Senate Rules56
4/5/20164/6/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/11/20164/3/2016Third Reading Passed (31-14)63A
House4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 31, 2016 10:41 A.M.