HB0723

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Assessment – Administration

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ebersole

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education, in entering or renewing a contract for the administration of the Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers assessment or a successor assessment, to require that each segment of the assessment be administered within a 40-minute time period; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Ebersole, Hettleman, Hill, Lam, Tarlau, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Ways and Means
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Partnerships
Public Schools
Students
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 21, 2018 5:51 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20182/22/2018Hearing canceled
2/26/20182/26/2018Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 23, 2018 5:10 P.M.