HB0730 (CH0075)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination Date

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sample-Hughes

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75


Synopsis:Altering the membership of the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council; and extending the termination date of specified provisions of law that establish and govern the Council to September 30, 2019.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Sample-Hughes, Anderton, Angel, Aumann, Barkley, Clippinger, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, C. Howard, Jameson, Kelly, Kramer, Krebs, Krimm, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, A. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Saab, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, and West
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0549
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Health -see also- Mental Health
Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care
Medical Assistance
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(13-3201, 13-3203)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2013)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/9/20163/9/2016Favorable with Amendments {886985/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/14/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (136-0)43A
Senate3/15/20163/15/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/16/20163/16/2016Reassigned to Finance45
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable Report by Finance
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
House4/7/20163/31/2016Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.