HB0733 (CH0136)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Local Government - Cross-References and Corrections

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136


Synopsis:Correcting specified cross-references to the Local Government Article in the Annotated Code of Maryland; correcting specified errors and omissions in and relating to the Local Government Article; clarifying the application of specified provisions; making specified conforming changes; deleting specified obsolete references; providing for the construction and effect of specified provisions of the Local Government Article; and making stylistic changes.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Local Government - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Annotated Code of Maryland
Chartered Counties
Code Counties
Corrective Legislation
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(15-109)
Article - Business Occupations and Professions
(1-203)
Article - Business Regulation
(1-204)
Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(12-401, 4-401, 5-114, 5-301, 6-410, 7-409, 7-501)
Article - Criminal Procedure
(13-104, 15-414)
Article - Criminal Law
(10-110, 13-302)
Article - Economic Development
(10-111, 10-340, 10-508, 12-112, 12-115, 12-205, 12-304, 12-308)
Article - Education
(3-203, 4-306.2, 5-602)
Article - Election Law
(13-604, 2-204, 6-102, 7-101, 7-102, 9-104)
Article - Environment
(15-504, 9-1608, 9-1614, 9-206, 9-505, 9-506, 9-697)
Article - Estates and Trusts
(2-108)
Article - Financial Institutions
(7-116, 7-223)
Article - Health - General
(14-402)
Article - Housing and Community Development
(4-1608, 4-1609, 4-231, 4-239, 4-247)
Article - Labor and Employment
(9-404)
Article - Land Use
(1-101, 11-206, 1-204, 1-206, 1-207, 1-301, 1-302, 1-402, 1-501, 17-208, 18-211, 22-403, 23-102, 5-104, 9-1607, 9-1608)
Article - Natural Resources
(3-107, 3-122, 3-908, 3-915, 5-307, 8-1103)
Article - Public Safety
(12-1004)
Article - Public Utilities
(22-204, 29-101, 29-102)
Article - Real Property
(10-704, 10-706, 10-707, 11B-104)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(5-606, 6-222, 8-117, 8-202)
Article - State Government
(15-802, 15-853, 2-1220, 2-1237)
Article - Tax - General
(11-102, 4-103)
Article - Tax - Property
(7-243, 9-102)
Article - Transportation
(5-419, 8-610, 8-630)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20132/5/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {120713/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (135-2)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs35
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.