HB0742 (CH0386)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority

Sponsored by:

Delegate Waldstreicher

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386


Synopsis:Authorizing a police officer to charge by citation for sale of an alcoholic beverage to an underage drinker or intoxicated person, malicious destruction of property if the amount of damage to property is less than $500, and theft of property or services with a value of less than $1,000; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Waldstreicher, McDermott, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Hough, K. Kelly, and Mitchell
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0991
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Citations
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Emergency Bills
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Theft -see also- Shoplifting
Vandalism
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(4-101)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 2, 2015 9:10 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20132/6/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {412010/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (136-2)47
Senate3/15/20133/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings46
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.