HB0743 (CH0537)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund Expenditures

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clagett

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537


Synopsis:Requiring the Comptroller to include on specified tax forms a demonstrative representation of how much of each dollar that the General Fund receives is spent on specified categories; providing that the representation may be in graphical or pictorial form; requiring the Comptroller to post the representation on the Comptroller's Web site and to include it in specified instructions on the Web site; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Clagett, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Bohanan, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Busch, Cane, Carr, Carter, Conway, Cullison, Davis, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Frick, Gaines, Griffith, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Hubbard, James, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Stein, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, Weir, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0604
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Ways and Means   View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Comptroller
Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Government
Forms
Health -see also- Mental Health
Income Tax
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Maps and Charts
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:51 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/3/20142/3/2014First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20142/6/2014Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20143/12/2014Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20143/10/2014Favorable46
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 46
3/14/20143/11/2014Favorable Report Adopted47
Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) {953225/1 Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/15/20143/12/2014Third Reading Passed (130-0)48A
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Budget and Taxation47
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/31/20143/22/2014Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/1/20143/23/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)57
House4/2/20143/26/2014Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:51 P.M.