HB0774

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hucker

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring a specified health care facility, on or before August 1, 2014, to establish a specified workplace violence prevention committee; requiring a workplace violence prevention committee, on or before October 1, 2014, to establish a specified workplace violence prevention program; requiring a workplace violence prevention program to include specified components; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, on or before July 1, 2014, to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Hucker, Barkley, Jameson, A. Kelly, Kramer, Love, McHale, and Vaughn
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0804
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Violence -see also- Domestic Violence; Harassment
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(5-1101 through 5-1103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.