HB0792 (CH0059)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support

Sponsored by:

Washington County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59


Synopsis:Requiring an inmate participating in specified home detention, work release, or pretrial release programs in Washington County to be responsible for costs of child support.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Washington County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0507
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Home Detention
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners -see also- Ex-Offenders
Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Correctional Services
(11-723)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20132/6/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)53A
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.