HB0811 (CH0022)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22


Synopsis:Requiring certain public school employers to provide an exclusive representative with access to new employee processing; requiring that the structure, time, and manner of certain access be determined through certain negotiations; authorizing certain parties to request certain impasse proceedings under certain circumstances; requiring the public school employer to provide the exclusive representative with certain information within 30 days of the date of hire or by the first pay period after the date of hire; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, Fennell, Tarlau, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0819
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Agents and Brokers
Collective Bargaining
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Mediation -see also- Arbitration
Notices
Postal Service
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
School Administration
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-401, 6-408, 6-501, 6-510, 6-407.1, 6-407.2, 6-509.1, 6-509.2)
Article - General Provisions
(4-311)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 1:39 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {605868/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until next session (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted 44
3/14/20183/11/2018Floor Amendment {763129/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-84)45
Floor Amendment {123324/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-84)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (84-49)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted51
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51
3/23/20183/21/2018Floor Amendment {883528/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)52
Floor Amendment {733328/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33)52
Second Reading Passed52
3/26/20183/22/2018Third Reading Passed (33-14)53
House3/27/20183/20/2018Returned Passed54
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 4:08 P.M.