HB0813 (CH0392)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study the Impact of Expanding Credit and Noncredit Courses for Students with Intellectual and Developmental Disabilities

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392


Synopsis:Creating the Task Force to Study the Impact of Expanding Credit and Noncredit Courses for Students with Intellectual and Developmental Disabilities; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kaiser, Eckardt, Arora, Bobo, Carr, Donoghue, Frick, Guzzone, Haynes, Healey, Hubbard, Luedtke, McDonough, A. Miller, Mitchell, Reznik, B. Robinson, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valentino-Smith, Vitale, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Zucker, and Howard
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Developmental Disabilities
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Reports
Students
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20132/6/2013First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable with Amendments {405669/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (135-1)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {194135/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)60
House4/4/20133/30/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (137-0)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.