HB0870 (CH0585)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County

Sponsored by:

Delegate Parrott

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585


Synopsis:Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources, in conjunction with the Department of Agriculture, to establish a program to control the spread of black flies in the State under specified circumstances; requiring that the program be implemented initially in Washington County on State-owned property, property owned by a local government, and private property with the owner's consent; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of Agriculture to accept, use or expend specified funding to implement the Act; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Parrott
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0876
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1169 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Natural Resources - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Agriculture, Department of
Environment, Department of
Gifts
Grants
Insects -see also- Bees
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds
Pest Control
Public Information
Reports
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Washington County
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(8-2201 through 8-2205)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20162/8/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20163/19/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/19/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments {650419/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (135-1)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {614233/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20163/31/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 60
4/7/20164/1/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {123622/1 Adopted61A
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)61A
House4/8/20164/2/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (138-0)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.