HB0877 (CH0555)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt Regulations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555


Synopsis:Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt specified regulations if the Board determines that specified acts, laws, or amendments authorize or require the reduction of specified dollar amounts or alteration of specified parameters pertaining to specified investment activities in Iran; clarifying the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Morhaim, Anderson, Arora, Aumann, Barnes, Barve, Burns, Cardin, Carr, Cluster, Cullison, DeBoy, Eckardt, Feldman, Frank, Frick, Haddaway-Riccio, Hubbard, Impallaria, Kaiser, Kipke, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Malone, McDermott, McDonough, A. Miller, W. Miller, Mizeur, Nathan-Pulliam, Olszewski, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Sophocleus, Stein, Stifler, Stocksdale, Summers, Tarrant, Waldstreicher, Weir, Hammen, Bromwell, Costa, Elliott, Kach, A. Kelly, Krebs, Murphy, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, and V. Turner
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Procurement
Narrow Subject(s):International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade
Investments -see also- Securities
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Statutes:Article - State Finance and Procurement
(17-701, 17-702, 17-703, 17-707)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2012)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {626780/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)43
Senate3/11/20133/11/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.