HB0879 (CH0031)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Integrity Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31


Synopsis:Altering provisions of the ethics law governing the period of time during which former members of the General Assembly are prohibited from representing or assisting specified parties for compensation in specified matters; altering the penalty for a specified offense relating to bribery of a public employee; altering the definition of "legislative action" to include testimony and other advocacy; prohibiting a state official from using public resources to solicit specified political contributions; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0683
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Ethics
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Attorney General
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Disclosure
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Ethics
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Political Parties
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Time
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(9-201)
Article - General Provisions
(5-101, 5-501, 5-502, 5-504, 5-506, 5-512, 5-513, 5-514, 5-602, 5-606, 5-607, 5-704)
Article - State Government
(2-710)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 10, 2017 9:01 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20172/6/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/21/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments {730510/1 Report Adopted52
Floor Amendment {433929/1 (Delegate Szeliga)52
Special Order until 03/22 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 52
3/23/20173/20/2017Floor Amendment {433929/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn54
Floor Amendment {393224/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/24/20173/21/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)55
Senate3/27/20173/23/2017First Reading Senate Rules52
3/29/20173/30/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {184238/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Floor Amendment {353423/1 (Senator Miller) Adopted (46-0)61
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (139-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.