HB0910

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required Studies

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rudolph

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of the Environment to require an applicant for a specified water quality certification to fund a specified study to determine the impact that the transport of specified sediment behind the Conowingo Dam may have on the Chesapeake Bay and specified other waters; requiring the Department to require the applicant to fund a specified study on the costs and benefits of specified methods of managing specified sediment behind the Conowingo Dam; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Rudolph and James
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Chesapeake Bay
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Flood Control
Hearings
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Pollution -see also- Sediment Control
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Sediment Control
Sunset
Water
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:51 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20142/5/2014First Reading Environmental Matters
2/7/20142/7/2014Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20142/20/2014Hearing cancelled
2/27/20142/27/2014Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:51 P.M.