HB0915

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to set a fee, by regulation, for specified services of the Advance Directive Registry; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to take the steps necessary to make the Registry operational on or before October 1, 2014.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Arora and Cullison
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0790
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Advance Medical Directives
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(5-620, 5-622)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20133/8/2013Hearing cancelled
3/12/20133/12/2013Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.