HB0924

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Western Piedmont Trail

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $125,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Western Piedmont Trail, located in Montgomery County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Dumais, and A. Miller
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0838
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2017 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 191). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 191 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Debt (Bond Bills)
Narrow Subject(s):Forests and Parks -see also- Program Open Space; Trees
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
State Bonds
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Appropriations
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.
3/9/20163/9/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Unfavorable Report by Appropriations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.