HB0930

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lee

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from maliciously using an interactive computer service to disclose or assist another person to disclose specified personal identifying information of an individual without the consent of the individual in order to annoy, threaten, embarrass, or harass the individual; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Lee, Arora, Conaway, DeBoy, Dumais, Eckardt, Glenn, Hough, McComas, McDonough, B. Robinson, Stocksdale, Stukes, Tarrant, F. Turner, and Valderrama
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Banks and Trust Companies
Credit
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Disclosure
Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Harassment
Identification
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Social Security
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Violence -see also- Domestic Violence; Harassment
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(8-301)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {902412/1 Report Adopted53A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53A
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.