HB0933 (CH0653)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Human Trafficking of Minor - Defense of Ignorance of Victim's Age

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653


Synopsis:Providing that a person charged with a specified human trafficking offense involving a minor may not assert a defense that the person did not know the age of the victim.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Lee, Aumann, Bobo, DeBoy, Dumais, Eckardt, Frick, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Guzzone, A. Kelly, Krebs, Luedtke, McComas, McDonough, Morhaim, Pendergrass, S. Robinson, F. Turner, Valderrama, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB0993 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Human Rights
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(11-303)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings50
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.