HB0941 (CH0656)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from filing false liens or encumbrances against another under specified circumstances; and providing for penalties for a violation of the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Arora and DeBoy
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0770
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Emergency Bills
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Personal Property
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Real Property
State Employees
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-807)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {852017/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.