HB0942 (CH0301)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully possessing, obtaining, or helping another to possess or obtain personal identifying information with fraudulent intent to access health information or health care; prohibiting a person from using a specified device knowingly, willfully, and with fraudulent intent to access health information or health care; providing penalties for a violation; authorizing a court to order restitution; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Lee (Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence) and Delegates Arora, Conaway, DeBoy, Dumais, Glenn, Hough, McComas, McDonough, Mitchell, B. Robinson, Stocksdale, Stukes, Tarrant, F. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0624
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Health -see also- Mental Health
Identification
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Restitution
Theft -see also- Shoplifting
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(8-301)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20132/19/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {712316/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/22/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)52
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.