HB0974

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot List

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring the State Board of Elections to establish guidelines for a subsequent election absentee ballot list; requiring that a voter who receives an absentee ballot be provided the opportunity to request an absentee ballot for the next subsequent election in the written materials accompanying the absentee ballot; requiring that a voter who requests an absentee ballot for the next subsequent election be placed on the subsequent election absentee ballot list for specified elections; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kramer, Arora, Barkley, Carr, Frick, Guzzone, Kaiser, Luedtke, Rudolph, and Simmons
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0657 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Ballots
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Developmental Disabilities
Disclosure
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Forms
Mental Health
Notices
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Voting -see also- Ballots; Elections
Statutes:Article - Election Law
(3-102, 3-501, 3-504, 9-303, 9-304, 9-305, 9-305.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing cancelled
2/26/20132/26/2013Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25/20133/25/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/25/20133/21/2013Favorable Report Adopted54
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 54
Second Reading Passed54
3/25/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (108-29)55
Senate3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs53
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.