HB0985

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Establishing that engaging in sexual contact with another without the consent of the other in connection with a first, second, or third degree burglary constitutes sexual offense in the third degree; establishing that, to be convicted under a specified provision of law, the defendant must also be convicted of a specified crime; altering the definitions of "tier I sex offender", "tier II sex offender", and "tier III sex offender" applicable to provisions relating to sex offender registration to include specified acts; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Clippinger, Anderson, Arora, Dumais, Guzzone, Hough, Howard, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, McComas, A. Miller, Parrott, Simmons, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, and Wilson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0722
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Burglary
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Sexual Offenses
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(11-701)
Article - Criminal Law
(3-307)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20132/12/2013Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {732519/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.