HB0991

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – Possession

Sponsored by:

Baltimore City Delegation

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from possessing a certain detachable magazine that has a capacity of more than 10 rounds of ammunition; prohibiting a person from possessing a regulated firearm if the person was previously convicted of a certain crime involving possessing, owning, carrying, or transporting a firearm after having been convicted of a certain other crime; and applying certain penalties.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Baltimore City Delegation (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1062
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Ex-Offenders
Guns
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(5-622)
Article - Public Safety
(5-133)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 16, 2018 3:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 8, 2018 5:17 P.M.