HB0999

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages

Sponsored by:

Worcester County Delegation

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Altering in Worcester County the privileges of specified alcoholic beverages licenses; creating a Class EF (entertainment facility) beer, wine and liquor license; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor from one or more outlets in a specified entertainment facility, for consumption anywhere throughout the entertainment facility only; increasing to $4,000 the maximum fine in the county that may be imposed on a person for a specified alcoholic beverages violation; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Worcester County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs -see also- Musms; Theat; etc
Excise Tax
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Personal Property
Real Property
Securities
Substance Abuse
Worcester County
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(11-304, 13-101, 6-201, 6-401)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
2/7/20132/7/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted51
Floor Committee Amendment {453494/1 Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted 53
3/25/20133/21/2013Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Barkley) Adopted54
Floor Committee Amendment {143393/1 Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/25/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)55
Senate3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs53
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (43-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.