HB1004

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cardin

Status:

In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation


Synopsis:Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax in the amount of $3,500 for qualifying members of the Maryland Civil Air Patrol, subject to specified conditions; providing for a delayed effective date; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Cardin, Stocksdale, Aumann, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Frank, Glass, Impallaria, McConkey, McDonough, Murphy, Sophocleus, Waldstreicher, Afzali, and Walker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0774
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0734 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Aircraft
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rescue Squads -see also- Ambulances; Emergency Medical Serv
Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {205669/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013First Reading Senate Rules61A
4/5/20134/5/2013Rereferred to Budget and Taxation

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.