HB1014 (CH0690)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

College Affordability Act of 2016

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jones

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690


Synopsis:Prohibiting a public institution of higher education from referring a delinquent student account or debt to the Central Collection Unit except under specified circumstances; requiring the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to develop and implement a specified marketing plan regarding the availability of a State contribution; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission and the Department of Legislative Services to hire a consultant to evaluate the effectiveness of the Office of Student Financial Assistance; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Jones, Kaiser, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barve, Branch, Busch, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Patterson, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, K. Young, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0676
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Colleges
Debt Management
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Grants
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Identification
Income Tax
Investments -see also- Securities
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Postal Service
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Tuition
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-1401, 18-1402, 18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-03, 18-19A-04, 18-19A-05, 18-301, 18-302, 18-303, 18-304, 18-306, 15-119, 18-114, 18-1905.1, 18-19A-04.1)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(3-302)
Article - Tax - General
(10-207, 10-208, 10-737)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {195361/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 46
3/18/20163/16/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {353620/1 Rejected (48-84)48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (89-45)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation48A
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20163/26/2016Favorable with Amendments {519230/155
Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted55
3/31/20163/27/2016Favorable with Amendments {519230/1 Report Adopted56A
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {883126/1 Adopted56A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56A
4/1/20163/28/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)57
House4/6/20163/30/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (92-45)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.