HB1031 (CH0518)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health Insurance

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518


Synopsis:Providing that, for purposes of calculating Maryland estate tax, the surviving spouse of a decedent shall include any individual to whom, at the time of the decedent's death, the decedent was lawfully married under State law; providing an income tax subtraction modification for specified costs incurred by a taxpayer to provide health insurance for the taxpayer's spouse; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Arora, Barve, Carr, Feldman, Gutierrez, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mizeur, and S. Robinson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0658
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0041 Session: 2007 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Income Tax
Marriage
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-208, 7-309)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {545163/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/6/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (130-0)65
Senate4/8/20134/2/2013First Reading Senate Rules64
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/8/20134/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/6/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.