HB1040 (CH0440)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Personnel - Disciplinary Appeal and Grievance Procedure Documents - Electronic Transmission

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440


Synopsis:Authorizing the electronic transmission of disciplinary appeal documents and decisions to appropriate parties; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to make forms for initiating and processing grievances available on the Department of Budget and Management's Web site; and authorizing the electronic transmission of copies of grievances and dispositions.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates M. Washington, Gaines, Guzzone, Proctor, Rosenberg, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0879
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Appropriations   View Committee HearingFinance   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Budget and Management, Department of
Discipline
Electronic Government
Forms
State Employees
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:52 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20142/6/2014First Reading Appropriations
2/19/20142/19/2014Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/10/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/11/20143/8/2014Favorable with Amendments {254166/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/12/20143/9/2014Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20143/10/2014First Reading Finance44
3/14/20143/14/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20144/3/2014Favorable Report by Finance
4/3/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/5/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20143/29/2014Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:52 P.M.