HB1042

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anderson

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Requiring the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors to issue an executor license to an applicant if the applicant is the appointed personal representative of a deceased surviving spouse's estate under specified circumstances; requiring an applicant for an executor license to submit to the Board within a specified time period the name of a licensed funeral director or mortician who has agreed to apply for a specified pre-need trustee license; requiring the Board to provide for the term of an executor license; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Anderson, Cullison, and Pena-Melnyk
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0648
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations   View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Cremation
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Estates and Trusts
Funerals
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Marriage
Morticians
News Media
Notices
Personal Representatives
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:52 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20142/6/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/12/20142/12/2014Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20143/15/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/15/20143/12/2014Favorable with Amendments {466781/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed (134-0)49
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable with Amendments {794937/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)58
House4/4/20143/28/2014House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (135-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:52 P.M.