HB1082

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Prince George's County - Property Tax Bill - Statement of Lien PG 433-16

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring that a property tax bill in Prince George's County must state the amount of any lien imposed by the county and that payment of the lien is due on or before September 30 of the taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:Prince George's County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(10-204.3)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/11/20162/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
2/22/20162/22/2016Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.