HB1082 (CH0573)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Bromwell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573


Synopsis:Requiring a county board of education to consult with the county superintendent of schools before any change in the hiring or termination of personnel in connection with a school health services program; requiring specified programs established by the State Board of Education to include instruction on heroin and opioid addiction and prevention, including information on the lethal effect of fentanyl; prohibiting specified personnel from being held personally liable under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Bromwell, Kipke, Hayes, Reznik, Wilkins, Morhaim, Platt, Malone, Pena-Melnyk, B. Wilson, Folden, Pendergrass, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1060
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Higher Education
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Office of the Courts
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Forms
Good Samaritan
Grants
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Nurses
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-401, 7-411, 11-1201 through 11-1204, 15-121, 7-426.5)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20172/9/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {116683/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017First Reading Senate Rules59
4/5/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {124438/2 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (139-0)69
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:04 P.M.