HB1105

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Zucker

Status:

Veto sustained (0-141)


Synopsis:Establishing a Task Force on the Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program to investigate ways to assist disabled individuals and their families to establish savings accounts to pay qualified expenses for specified disabled individuals; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; requiring the General Assembly to consider legislation proposed by the Task Force to establish an ABLE program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Zucker, Kelly, McIntosh, B. Barnes, Barve, Gaines, Hammen, Haynes, Hixson, Jones, A. Miller, Beitzel, Carozza, Chang, Ciliberti, Ghrist, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, Lierman, McKay, B. Robinson, Sophocleus, Vogt, Wivell, P. Young, Kipke, and Szeliga
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0761
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Disabled
Narrow Subject(s):Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Facilities and Services
Disabilities, Department of
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Forms
Health -see also- Mental Health
Hearings
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Income Tax
Investments -see also- Securities
Job Training
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Nonresidents -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Power of Attorney
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Sunset
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Tuition
Vocational Rehabilitation
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:45 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/16/20152/16/2015First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/20153/9/2015Rereferred to Appropriations
3/10/20153/10/2015Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/20/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments {964961/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/20/20153/19/2015Third Reading Passed (137-0)49
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Budget and Taxation47A
3/27/20153/27/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20153/25/2015Favorable with Amendments {259438/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/31/20153/26/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)53
House4/6/20153/31/2015House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments61
House Requests Senate Recede61
Conference Committee Appointed61
Delegates Zucker, Sophocleus, and Carozza61
Senate4/8/20154/1/2015Senate Refuses to Recede59
Conference Committee Appointed59
Senators Serafini, Guzzone, and Ferguson59
House4/9/20154/3/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (138-0)64
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted60
Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/9/20154/3/2015Passed Enrolled60
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
House1/13/20161/13/2016Veto sustained (0-141)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:45 P.M.